Saturday, September 19, 2009

MATHS TRICKS

Multiplication:
Multiplying any two digit number with 11(ELEVEN)
 11*11

take only 11 and add the two digits it will bring 2.----(i)
now take the 11 and write the 11 as 1space1.---(ii)
1space1--within the space put 2.---from (i)
now the answer will be 121.


don't get confused,we will discuss it with another example.
36*11
take only 36 and add 3 and 6 it will bring 9----(i)
now take 3 and 6 write 36 as 3space6----(ii)
3space6--within the space put 9 which we got it from first step{here space=3+6}

now the answer will be 396.
got it.
if u have doubts u can post comment...




16 comments:

Anonymous said...

this is realy helpful for me...
and i request u to solve this problem....i mean if u have any short trick for this type of multiply....998*86

rakesh said...

how 2 multiply 3 digits wid 11

Krishna said...

nice trick... thanks continume

Anonymous said...

Dose it work with numbers like 55,79 etc where the addition brings a two digit no? if yes please tell how. thank you... my id is bandhoo4u@gmail.com

riks said...

how to solve 56 * 11 ??

Anonymous said...

this is realy helpful for me...

Sugan said...

Found it really useful, can you include some more. I have found another place that has similar tricks but it is not free.

Sonu said...

this is really a nice trick..................
and for 3 digits the process is same
like...
123*11=1(space 1)(space 2)3
(space 2)=3+2=5
and
(space 1)=1+2=3
therefore the answer is 1353
best of luck.......

Sonu said...

this is really a nice trick..................
and for 3 digits the process is same
like...
123*11=1(space 1)(space 2)3
(space 2)=3+2=5
and
(space 1)=1+2=3
therefore the answer is 1353
best of luck.......

Anonymous said...

multiplying wit 11 with any number can be easy
eg 11*3333 can be done as

3333+
3333
________________]
36663

hope u will find it helpful.....

sidhu nambiar said...

multiplying wit 11 with any number can be easy
eg 11*3333 can be done as

3333+
3333
________________]
36663

hope u will find it helpful.....

Anonymous said...

Thanks for this short trick!

Anonymous said...

how to mmultiply 47,68 with 11, where adding both digits wil bring a 2 digit no? plz reply me my id is abhijith_r666@yahoo.com

niharika garg said...

how to multiply 567*56 very fast,

Anonymous said...

how to multiply 576*67 with a trick???

Anonymous said...

How about 39*11